+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 676 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Chichester agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 982063854-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982063854
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations