+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECEDE (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate receded from substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (77-Y 20-N)
- (67 affirmative votes required for adoption)
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- Senate substitute rejected by House (57-Y 39-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (57-Y 39-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 009226650-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 009226650-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 009226650-S1
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 008703650
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: RECEDE (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (77-Y 20-N)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (57-Y 39-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor