+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 33-N)
- Read third time and passed House (67-Y 33-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 060303320-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Hamilton agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB262EH1
- Printed as engrossed 060303320-EH1
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 060303320-H1
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: Higher Education (Rust)
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066606320
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2006: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 33-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor