+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2616ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2616H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 055541448-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 055541448-H1
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (17-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052225118
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 8-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (17-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor