+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
On March 22, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 592 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2615ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 053256448-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2615E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053256448