+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Stricken at request of Patron in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 032342254
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2003: Stricken at request of Patron in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor