+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB261ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 066588320-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB261E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066588320
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor