+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0389)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 389 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB261ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On December 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101776D