+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
On March 9, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2609ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 8-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 973275252
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor