+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
On March 18, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2601ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD4423300-H1
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee substitute agreed to LD4423300-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4423300-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause LD9840000
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor