+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2600ER)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senators: Potts, Puckett, Barry
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Delegates: Deeds, Croshaw, Kilgore
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 95-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (4-Y 95-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 1-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 1-N 2-A)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 991600112-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991600112-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 991600112-H1
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 994633312
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 95-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 1-N 2-A)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1999: Reported from General Laws with sub. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor