+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB260ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103039D
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor