+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0675)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 675 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB260ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (19-Y 79-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (19-Y 79-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Diamonstein, Putney, Wagner
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senators: Houck, Saslaw, Hawkins
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Norment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989751204-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989751204-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reconsidered by Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 989751204-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (28-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 984486204
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations