+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 13 (effective 7/1/06)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB260ER)
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 9-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067221200
+ − Votes (5)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor