+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2598ER)
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senators: Martin, Edwards, Bell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Delegates: Ware, O., Athey, Nutter
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from G.L. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 057990208
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2005: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2005: Rereferred from G.L. (14-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2005: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor