+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1501-Cosgrove) (13-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (17-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: Subcommittee # 2
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053520328
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2005: Incorporated by Tra. (HB1501-Cosgrove) (13-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from Tra. (17-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor