+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 28, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2596ER)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 057820400-H2
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 78-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 057802712-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2596S1
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 78-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (34-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: May, Wardrup, Scott, J.M.
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Wagner, Watkins, Puckett
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 057802712-S1
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2596H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053129400-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053129400-H1
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (24-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Tra. w/amds (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053514328
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (34-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 78-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Appropriations with sub (24-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2005: Reported from Tra. w/amds (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor