+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Requires 66 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 32-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto (64-Y 32-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB259ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
- Read third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation
On December 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102128D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2016: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 32-N)
February 22, 2016: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 19, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 27, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
January 20, 2016: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
January 19, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor