+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 019263720-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 019263720-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 019263720-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 014679252