+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 073179502-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2575E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073179502
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor