+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Title replaced
- Floor amendment agreed to (Dillard)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD0266212-E
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD0266212
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor