+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On March 22, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2568ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 035126648-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 035126648-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 035126648-H1
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 035079648
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor