+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD0972127-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD0972127-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed LD0972127-H1
- Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/sub. (10-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented & ordered printed LD3760127
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: Reported from Ches. & Its Trib. w/sub. (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor