+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 54-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (45-Y 54-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 044240364-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB256E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (12-Y 10-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/04 044240364
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2004: VOTE: DEFEATED (45-Y 54-N)
February 5, 2004: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (12-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor