+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (56)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- No further action taken
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Reid, Katzen, Johnson
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senators: Edwards, Reynolds, Forbes
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 994375655-H1
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report rejected by House (47-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (47-Y 47-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 991844655-S2 (Edwards)
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected
- Substitute #1 by Sen. Edwards withdrawn 991841655-S3
- Floor substitute printed 991841655-S3 (Edwards)
- Substitute #2 by Sen. Edwards agreed to 991844655-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 991844655-S2 (Edwards)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House (9-Y 91-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (9-Y 91-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (8-Y 4-N 2-A)
- Committee substitute printed 994830424-S1
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal & Procedure Law
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Printed as engrossed 990462424-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 990462424
- Consent to introduce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (47-Y 47-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (9-Y 91-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (8-Y 4-N 2-A)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor