+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
On March 21, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2555ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 970932176
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor