+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
On March 25, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2554ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (81-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 19-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. Stolle rejected (20-Y 20-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 018431872-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Mims agreed to 018432500-S2
- Reading of amendment waived
- Floor substitute printed 018432500-S2 ( Mims, Newman and W
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (20-Y 20-N)
- Tie vote, chair votes nay
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute 018432500-S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 8-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 018431872-S1
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider motion to pass by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (14-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Ingram rejected
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 019193872-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Del. Jackson agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds 019193872-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 019193872-EH1
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 019193872-H1
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (21-Y 3-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 016037872