+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 129 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2552ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (9-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented & ordered printed LD0055364
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 5, 1995: Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor