+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
On March 16, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 3/16/03)
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2550ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.01/08/03 037709226