+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 1/1/21)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2548ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19101934D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2548E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101934D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor