+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2547ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 4-N)
- Amendment by Senator Sturtevant agreed to
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105726D-H1
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 19105726D-EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Hugo agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2547EH1
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105726D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103847D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 4-N)
February 13, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor