+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (58)
On March 13, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0152)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 152 (effective 3/10/95)
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: AMDT #4 ADOPTION (34-Y 64-N)
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- House rejected Gov's #1 recommendation (40-Y 58-N)
- VOTE: AMDT #1 ADOPTION (40-Y 58-N)
- House rejected Gov's #2 recommendation (37-Y 62-N)
- VOTE: AMDT #2 ADOPTION (37-Y 62-N)
- House concurred in Gov's #3 recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AMDT #3 ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House rejected Gov's #4 recommendation (34-Y 64-N)
- House concurred in Gov's #5 recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2543ER)
- VOTE: AMDT #5 ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's #3, 5, 6 recom. (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. REC. IN PART (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: AMDT #7 ADOPTION (38-Y 59-N)
- House rejected Gov's #7 recommendation (38-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: AMDT #6 ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's #6 recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed LD3274681-S2 (Holland, R.J.)
- Committee substitute rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor sub. agd. to LD3274681-S2 (Holland, R. J.)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. LD3274681-S2
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2543ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3261124-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD5999124-H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5999124-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD5999124-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed LD3639124
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. REC. IN PART (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #2 ADOPTION (37-Y 62-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #3 ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #4 ADOPTION (34-Y 64-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #5 ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #6 ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #7 ADOPTION (38-Y 59-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: AMDT #1 ADOPTION (40-Y 58-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor