+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2542ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (71-Y 27-N 1-A)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2542H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105682D-H1
- Read second time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105682D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103471D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 31, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N 1-A)
January 25, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor