+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (91)
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0852)
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 852 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: AMDT 5 REJECTED (44-Y 56-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 1 REJECTED (44-Y 56-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #2 (45-Y 54-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 2 REJECTED (45-Y 54-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #3 (45-Y 54-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 3 REJECTED (45-Y 54-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #4 (42-Y 58-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 4 REJECTED (42-Y 58-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #5 (44-Y 56-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #1 (44-Y 56-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #6 (43-Y 57-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 6 REJECTED (43-Y 57-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #7 (43-Y 56-N)
- VOTE: AMDT 7 REJECTED (43-Y 56-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- House rejected Gov's rec. #8, 9, 10, 11 (42-Y 57-N)
- VOTE: AMDTS 8,9,10,11 REJECTED (42-Y 57-N)
- Motion to pass bill in enrolled form rejected (57-Y 43-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (57-Y 43-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2542ER)
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed LD5888476-H3
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of conf. report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Van Landingham, Jackson, Reynolds
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Holland, C. A., Saslaw, Nolen
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 98-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5883476-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Floor amendments rejected (Bell)
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD5883476-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD5883476-S1
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Floor amendment agreed to (Cranwell)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected LD3689124-H1
- Floor substitute printed LD5869476-H2 (Van Landingham)
- Floor substitute agreed to LD5869476-H2 (Van Landingham)
- Floor amendment withdrawn (Fisher)
- Motion for pending question agreed to (50-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (50-Y 47-N)
- Eng. by House-fl.sub. w/amd. LD5869476-EH2(Van Landingham)
- Printed as engrossed LD5869476-EH2
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD3689124-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (15-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed LD4390476
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (24)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 4 REJECTED (42-Y 58-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 5 REJECTED (44-Y 56-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDTS 8,9,10,11 REJECTED (42-Y 57-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 7 REJECTED (43-Y 56-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 6 REJECTED (43-Y 57-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (57-Y 43-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 1 REJECTED (44-Y 56-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 2 REJECTED (45-Y 54-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: AMDT 3 REJECTED (45-Y 54-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (38-Y 2-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 1-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1995: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 11-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (50-Y 47-N)
February 3, 1995: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from Education (15-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor