+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2541ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (30-Y 63-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments # 1 and 2 agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate amendment #3 rejected by House (30-Y 63-N)
- Delegates: Amundson, Sherwood, Poindexter
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Puller, Stolle, Reynolds
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Substitute bill reprinted 091550412-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2541H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 091550412-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 091550412-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 098136412
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 28, 2009: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (30-Y 63-N)
February 26, 2009: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2009: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor