+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 1/1/20)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2540ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 94-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Byron, Ransone, Kory
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Howell, Dunnavant, Boysko
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19100843D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2540E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100843D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (10)
February 22, 2019: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N)
February 13, 2019: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
January 25, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor