+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2538ER)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 050171116
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2005: Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor