+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0389)
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 389 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2535ER)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 993635216-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mrs. Drake agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (18-Y 6-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 993635216