+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
On March 16, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2532ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 977532364-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (18-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 977532364
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor