+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2531ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (61-Y 14-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 090246588-S1 (61-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 090246588-S1 (68-Y 7-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2531S1
- Amendments by Senator McEachin withdrawn
- Passed by temporarily
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 7-N)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 090246588-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed by for the day
- Amendments #4 & 5 by Senator McEachin withdrawn
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 090246588-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2531H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 090176588-H1
- Substitute bill reprinted 090176588-H1
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 090176588-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: 3 Energy
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 098736588
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 1-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (68-Y 7-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (61-Y 14-N)
February 24, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor