+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 2/15/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 13, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency clause added
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106700D-S2 (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 4-N)
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2529ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2529S2
- Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 19106700D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 19106700D-S2 (Newman)
- Committee substitute rejected 19106602D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106602D-S1
- Read second time
- Incorporates HB2355 (Jones, S.C.)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to pass by temporarily until completion of HB2355 agreed to
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Motion to pass by until end of calendar agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute (51-Y 43-N) HB2529H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104698D-H1
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 43-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19104698D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104278D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 4-N)
February 11, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
February 8, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
February 1, 2019: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 43-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor