+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
On March 21, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2524ER)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2524H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 051982440-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 051982440-H1
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 050180440
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2005: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor