+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2515ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (78-Y 15-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (78-Y 15-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Trumbo reconsidered (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Trumbo rejected
- Amendment #3 by Sen. Trumbo agreed to
- Reengrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Trumbo agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 035064836-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 035064836