+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 2/25/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2505ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 097445540-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2505E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 097445540
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2009: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor