+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 426 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2504ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (67-Y 33-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (67-Y 33-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 091954352-H1
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (4-Y 84-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2504S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 092928212-S1
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (4-Y 84-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Whipple, Reynolds, Quayle
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Amundson, Massie, Orrock
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 092928212-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (76-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 091911818-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2504E
- Amendment by Delegate Amundson agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: 1
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 091911818
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2009: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (67-Y 33-N)
February 18, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (4-Y 84-N)
February 18, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
February 2, 2009: Reported from Finance (12-Y 10-N)
January 28, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor