+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 82 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2503ER)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 990750490
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 11, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1999: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1999: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor