+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0626)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 626 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2501ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11104229D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2501E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 11104229D