+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Wills/Trusts/Estates
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD7381346