+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0666)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 666 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2494ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2494H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104849D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104849D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 11103664D