+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2493ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101774D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor